NEW HACKNEY EDUCATION BUSINESS PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1111037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mohammed Moradi Trustee 10 April 2019 None on record
Richard Stephens Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record
TRACEY FLETCHER Trustee 16 January 2014 None on record
Kishen Gajjar Trustee 02 March 2021 None on record
Sue Maskrey Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
JENNY WILKINS Trustee
THE IDEAS FOUNDATION
15BILLIONEBP Received: 5 days late
Jason Bridgewater Trustee 11 April 2019 None on record
Kim Maria Caplin Trustee 07 June 2018 None on record
Sally Pain Trustee 26 April 2019 None on record
MATTHEW JAMES SPARKES Chair
THE FRIENDS OF HOLY TRINITY, FOREST GREEN Received: On time