Financial history GLOBAL ALLIANCE FOR LIVESTOCK VETERINARY MEDICINES

Charity number: 1115606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.16m £19.22m £5.85m £12.36m £16.93m
Total expenditure £12.52m £13.16m £11.48m £11.42m £11.19m
Income from government contracts £954.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.10m £2.39m £1.75m £2.44m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.12m £19.11m £5.66m £12.16m £16.91m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.69k £108.18k £184.77k £199.84k £13.78k
Income - Other £782 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.52m £13.16m £11.48m £11.42m £11.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £81.31k £72.07k £126.02k £86.28k £3.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0