Trustees GLOBAL ALLIANCE FOR LIVESTOCK VETERINARY MEDICINES

Charity number: 1115606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Paul Wood Chair 21 September 2017
None on record
Dr Henry Matukho Wamwayi Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Dr Fabian Martin Kausche Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Dr Alice Hope Banga Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Janet Mary Stevenson Trustee 15 September 2020
None on record
Dr Junaidu Maina Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Shraman Jha Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Dr Isabelle Dieuzy-Labaye Trustee 20 September 2018
None on record
Professor Margaret Gill Trustee 21 September 2017
THE STAPLEDON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time