Financial history BRIGHTER FUTURE INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1110823
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £513.39k £569.78k £139.27k £166.63k £143.11k
Total expenditure £369.26k £674.86k £158.36k £180.27k £125.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £513.39k £569.78k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £5 £4 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £369.26k £671.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £3.86k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.26k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £364.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A