Accounts and annual returns NEW PARK COMMUNITY AND ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1110112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 24 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 21 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 16 July 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 16 July 2019 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window