Financial history FRIENDS OF ST. PAULS SCHOOL, YORK

Charity number: 1111254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £9.85k £6.90k £6.70k £4.79k £8.00k
Total expenditure £10.50k £5.29k £8.15k £2.99k £3.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A