THE KITCHEN TABLE CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1110829
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 01 May 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 17 September 2019 140 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 30 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 06 February 2018 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 20 February 2018 296 days late Download