THE KITCHEN TABLE CHARITIES TRUST

Charity number: 1110829
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £236.05k £177.71k £197.21k £132.99k £122.14k
Total expenditure £213.69k £333.24k £178.47k £200.69k £169.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A