Financial history TRUMPET SOUND MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1110544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £10.31k £5.91k £3.54k £2.37k £4.11k
Total expenditure £9.84k £6.00k £3.71k £1.80k £4.83k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A