GAYTON CHURCH HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1111145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £5.68k £3.39k £5.02k £5.60k £1.97k
Total expenditure £5.40k £2.94k £7.57k £5.84k £1.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A