ACE AFRICA (UK)

Charity number: 1111283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 17 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 16 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 22 June 2016 On time Download