AFRICAN EDUCATIONAL CULTURAL AND HEALTH ORGANISATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1111023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.10k £3.44k £5.28k £9.05k £2.89k
Total expenditure £6.76k £4.18k £3.13k £11.42k £3.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A