THE FRIENDS OF BERKELEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1110904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.48k £14.23k £12.56k £14.95k £5.75k
Total expenditure £8.25k £12.25k £9.83k £9.34k £13.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A