Financial history WORLD EYE CANCER HOPE

Charity number: 1111133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £755 £145 £1.46k £216 £486
Total expenditure £290 £336 £547 £425 £427
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A