AFRICAN REFUGEE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT "ARCD"

Charity number: 1111602
Charity reporting is overdue by 938 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Annual return 01 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 572 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Overdue Overdue by 572 days
Annual return 01 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 938 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2018 Overdue Overdue by 938 days
Annual return 01 May 2017 20 April 2018 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2016 11 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2016 Not Required