AFRICAN REFUGEE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT "ARCD"

Charity number: 1111602
Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/05/2013 01/05/2014 01/05/2015 01/05/2016 01/05/2017
Total gross income £700 £300 £500 £0 £30
Total expenditure £550 £290 £450 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A