Financial history JOHN INNES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1111527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £742.25k £804.31k £970.23k £873.81k £1.08m
Total expenditure £906.72k £1.65m £1.43m £2.29m £3.59m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £34.86k £0 £0 £45.56k £48.13k
Income - Charitable activities £141.73k £156.65k £158.14k £106.48k £117.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £565.66k £647.66k £657.09k £703.68k £872.86k
Income - Other £0 £0 £155.00k £18.09k £36.69k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £821.43k £1.57m £1.30m £2.19m £3.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £85.29k £80.90k £124.84k £105.64k £176.12k
Expenditure - Governance £110.52k £89.69k £120.10k £110.80k £93.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £365.38k £1.45m £845.22k £1.71m £2.95m
Expenditure - Investment management £63.33k £80.90k £104.86k £86.74k £140.71k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0