JOHN INNES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1111527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Rosemary Hails Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Keith Richard Norman Trustee 23 October 2013
LINKING ENVIRONMENT AND FARMING Received: On time
Dr TINA BARSBY Trustee 01 July 2017
NIAB EMR Received: On time
DR DAVID LAWRENCE Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
PETER DAVID INNES Chair None on record
David John Hill Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record