Financial history IVAN AND REBECCA TWIGDEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1111791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £9.50k £9.50k £9.50k £9.50k £119.06k
Total expenditure £16.60k £15.15k £8.10k £10.60k £14.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A