Financial history YORK CITY KNIGHTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112571
Charity reporting is overdue by 60 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 30/09/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £99.70k £56.59k £81.84k £82.39k £110.82k
Total expenditure £96.38k £68.72k £85.98k £91.10k £103.52k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £8.00k £10.00k