Accounts and annual returns YORK CITY KNIGHTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112571
Charity reporting is overdue by 66 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Overdue by 66 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Overdue by 66 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 08 December 2021 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 08 December 2021 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 05 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 10 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 September 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 03 September 2018 35 days late Download Open in new window