Financial history ST MARY'S PARISH TRUST

Charity number: 1112724
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £95.43k £96.18k £96.87k £96.73k £54.06k
Total expenditure £118.71k £112.11k £113.12k £126.53k £98.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A