Trustees ST MARY'S PARISH TRUST

Charity number: 1112724
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev JOHN WHITTAKER Chair 01 September 2018
MILES TRUST FOR THE PUTNEY AND ROEHAMPTON COMMUNITY
Received: On time
THE BIGGS-WYMONDESOLD TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHARITY
Received: On time
PEST HOUSES FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ALL SAINTS' PUTNEY
Received: On time
THE PUTNEY PARISH DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
PUTNEY RELIEF COMMITTEE
Received: On time
Andrew Grocott Trustee 18 June 2022
None on record
Christiaan Viljoen de Lange Trustee 13 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ALL SAINTS' PUTNEY
Received: On time
Norman Alexander Wilson Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
Bethan Deakins Trustee 28 November 2013
None on record