FRIENDS OF ATWOOD PRIMARY

Charity number: 1112103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 December 2018 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 December 2018 34 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 December 2017 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required