FRIENDS OF ATWOOD PRIMARY

Charity number: 1112103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.15k £28.11k £25.08k £43.30k £19.93k
Total expenditure £3.25k £28.39k £23.89k £41.90k £17.35k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A