Financial history SAMLING INSTITUTE FOR YOUNG ARTISTS

Charity number: 1112032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £284.94k £306.72k £294.68k £286.16k £290.47k
Total expenditure £299.58k £359.21k £286.62k £169.91k £303.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A