Financial history ST ANDREWS JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1112086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.51k £2.29k £5.00k £2.86k £2.80k
Total expenditure £2.63k £3.69k £4.39k £3.21k £3.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A