RIGHT TO PLAY UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1112404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.95m £1.74m £1.68m £1.54m £1.25m
Total expenditure £1.82m £2.20m £1.38m £1.80m £1.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £257.48k £233.14k £118.78k N/A £45.76k
Income - Donations and legacies £751.69k £412.85k £803.09k £551.09k £684.51k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £1.33m £871.60k £989.40k £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.20m £0 £0 £0 £560.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £71 £40 £408 £34 £138
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.56m £778.70k £1.17m £869.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £687.68k £642.03k £605.87k £630.59k £433.94k
Expenditure - Governance £20.98k £18.35k £15.54k £20.50k £21.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0