RIGHT TO PLAY UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1112404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chimene Crawford Trustee 12 September 2018 None on record
Amy Blackwell Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
Kjartan Rist Trustee 06 June 2018 None on record
PERIHAN BASSATNE Trustee 07 April 2021
The International Medical Education Trust Received: On time
Lindsay Groves Trustee 07 April 2021 None on record
Mireille Abujawdeh Trustee 07 April 2021 None on record
Marijana Kolak Trustee 08 February 2017 None on record
Louisa Watts Trustee 27 November 2019 None on record
SIMON HOLDEN Chair None on record
Nancy Curtin Trustee 01 April 2020 None on record
James Fleming Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
LESLIE MCCORMACK GATHY Trustee None on record
Patrick Cannon Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record