Financial history ASYLUM JUSTICE

Charity number: 1112026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £65.00k £106.25k £134.83k £223.19k £318.18k
Total expenditure £56.54k £94.69k £112.47k £171.12k £313.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.12k £28.32k £6.06k £151.98k £125.84k