Accounts and annual returns MENTER BRO OGWR

Charity number: 1112683
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window