Financial history MENTER BRO OGWR

Charity number: 1112683
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £214.93k £234.91k £173.41k £162.26k £177.32k
Total expenditure £217.48k £236.93k £177.71k £157.46k £175.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £81.50k
Income from government grants £73.47k £89.42k £77.58k £71.01k N/A