FAITH&VICTORY CHURCH

Charity number: 1113213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 10/10/2015 10/10/2016 10/10/2017 10/10/2018 10/10/2019
Total gross income £14.28k £24.98k £16.34k £20.00k £11.40k
Total expenditure £14.20k £24.90k £16.30k £19.70k £11.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A