FAITH&VICTORY CHURCH

Charity number: 1113213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAISSA ETUTU Trustee 09 September 2014 None on record
SHAKYL JOHNSON Trustee 03 May 2015 None on record
Patrice King Trustee 07 April 2016 None on record
Kalala Max Nyembwe Trustee 18 May 2014 None on record
REMEAL ANTONREECE JOHNSON Trustee 06 June 2013 None on record