Accounts and annual returns THE DEATH PENALTY PROJECT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1115035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 January 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window