Financial history THE DEATH PENALTY PROJECT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1115035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £137.26k £197.22k £21.64k £211.48k £146.67k
Total expenditure £138.69k £132.98k £86.57k £214.02k £144.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A