TEIGN HOUSING

Charity number: 1112196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.99m £18.77m £19.10m £20.08m £20.56m
Total expenditure £13.86m £13.54m £13.70m £14.88m £16.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £18.81k £92.89k £81.67k £121.07k
Income from government grants £161.00k £122.00k N/A £364.00k £299.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £18.99m £18.71m £19.10m £20.08m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.55m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.86m £13.54m £13.70m £14.88m £16.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0