TEIGN HOUSING

Charity number: 1112196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Higginson Trustee 29 July 2021 None on record
Andrew Jones Chair 22 July 2017 None on record
Joanna Reece Trustee 15 December 2016 None on record
Stephen Cook Trustee 28 March 2019 None on record
JAMES O'DWYER Trustee 12 September 2011 None on record
Stuart Davies Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Maureen Robinson Trustee 12 March 2015 None on record
ANGELA EDWARDS-JONES Trustee 28 December 2012 None on record