HOME-START NORTH-WEST HAMPSHIRE

Charity number: 1112233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £115.86k £137.32k £160.50k £129.80k £125.90k
Total expenditure £101.32k £118.23k £135.85k £145.94k £131.24k
Income from government contracts £30.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £16.40k £0 £10.40k N/A N/A