HOME-START NORTH-WEST HAMPSHIRE

Charity number: 1112233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patricia Louise Fox Trustee 18 September 2020 None on record
Natalie Fletcher Trustee 18 November 2016 None on record
Jane Drew Trustee 19 June 2020
HELPING HANDS IN TADLEY Received: On time
ELIZABETH JANE TAYLOR Trustee 07 February 2019 None on record
SHEREN ROSE BUTLER Trustee 16 March 2018 None on record
Dr Naila Naheed Aslam Trustee 16 July 2021 None on record
Mark Flower Trustee 17 May 2017
ROTARY CLUB OF BASINGSTOKE TRUST FUND Overdue by 270 days
FLOWER CHARITABLE TRUST Recently registered
JEFFREY NORTHAM Trustee 10 May 2017
DUMMER READING ROOM (KNOWN LOCALLY AS DUMMER VILLAGE HALL) Received: On time
Lauren Rebecca English Trustee 18 September 2020 None on record
JANETTE MARGARET HEWITT Chair
HEATH END VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
TADLEY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU Received: On time
MARGARET LOUISA BATES Trustee None on record