AGUDA NORTH WEST

Charity number: 1112554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 June 2021 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 June 2021 124 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 June 2020 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 June 2020 143 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 February 2018 22 days late Download