ST PETERS HALL WOODHALL SPA

Charity number: 1112649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 14 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 27 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required