ST PETERS HALL WOODHALL SPA

Charity number: 1112649
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £9.37k £9.87k £8.07k £9.40k £18.53k
Total expenditure £7.90k £8.27k £15.78k £9.32k £8.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.96k