Trustees ZANE: ZIMBABWE A NATIONAL EMERGENCY
Charity number: 1112949

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BROADLEY CMG | Chair | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
David Gordon Covell | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Passaportis OBE | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Major General Angus Ramsay CBE DSO | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MELLOR OBE | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR RICHARD EKINS KC HON | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER DEAN COMPSTON | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MARY GAYNER | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.