ART REFUGE

Charity number: 1114353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £23.92k £57.21k £57.51k £44.17k £60.37k
Total expenditure £27.89k £59.32k £51.09k £52.66k £45.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £4.90k N/A