Accounts and annual returns THARA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1112702
Charity reporting is overdue by 297 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 297 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Overdue by 297 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 08 September 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 November 2021 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 10 November 2020 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 16 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window