Financial history THARA WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1112702
Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £34.88k £50.07k £15.24k £14.63k £23.95k
Total expenditure £55.33k £26.42k £36.69k £38.19k £17.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A