Financial history ST NINIAN'S CHURCH, WHITBY

Charity number: 1113013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.90k £20.05k £10.40k £3.77k £839
Total expenditure £13.65k £20.15k £10.91k £3.86k £684
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A