SOUTHWARK REFUGEE PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 1116472
Charity reporting is overdue by 506 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 140 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 140 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 March 2018 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 March 2017 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required