Financial history THE NATIONAL GARDEN SCHEME

Charity number: 1112664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.23m £4.40m £4.31m £4.65m £1.63m
Total expenditure £4.32m £4.43m £4.55m £4.71m £1.36m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £176.65k £171.35k £134.50k £140.01k £367.48k
Income - Other trading activities £4.03m £4.22m £4.16m £4.48m £1.21m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.88k £10.51k £16.76k £27.51k £18.61k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £30.73k
Income - Legacies £36.09k £40.94k £5.00k £10.00k £29.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.14m £3.30m £3.19m £3.30m £1.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £914.86k £921.77k £1.09m £1.12m £1.04m
Expenditure - Governance £22.52k £19.88k £11.00k £6.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.12m £3.28m £3.00m £3.22m £1.88k
Expenditure - Investment management £2.77k £3.30k £3.95k £5.19k £8.51k
Expenditure - Other £269.09k £214.98k £280.78k £298.76k £314.34k